MO SB596 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 596-Riddle, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that a person who is injured by a product has 10 years after the sale or lease of the product to bring a suit for damages

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that a person who is injured by a product has 10 years after the sale or lease of the product to bring a suit for damages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 596-Riddle, with SCS
2018-03-01SenateBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-02-15SenateReported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS
2018-01-31SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (4176S.04C)
2018-01-24SenateHearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
2018-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 596-Riddle
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback