MO SB590 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to first degree murder
Title
Modifies provisions related to first degree murder
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 590 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 590 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 590 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 590 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-12 | House | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-05-12 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2016-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-05-12 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-12 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(4323H06.12H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-05-04 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCA 1 |
2016-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/Amendments |
2016-04-27 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-25 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-21 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-21 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SA 6 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Wasson)--(4323S05.15S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SA 5 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Nasheed)--(4323S05.14S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SA 4 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(4323S05.08S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SA 3 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(4323S05.10S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(4323S05.09S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(4323S05.12S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered (Dixon)--(4323S.05F) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SA 8 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaefer)--(4323S03.19S) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SA 7 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schaefer)--(4323S03.04S) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SA 6 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(4323S03.15S) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(4323S03.09S) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Keaveny)--(4323S03.18S) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-05 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered (Keaveny)--(4323S03.07S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Nasheed)--(4323S03.10S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(4323S03.06S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Dixon)--(4323S.03F) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4323S.02C) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 590-Dixon |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |