MO SB588 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (3738S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (3738S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates additional protections to the right to bear arms
Title
Creates additional protections to the right to bear arms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (3738S.02C) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 588-Burlison |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |