MO SB585 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the calculation of the limitation for punitive damages
Title
Modifies the calculation of the limitation for punitive damages
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 585-Dixon |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723613 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB585.pdf |