MO SB579 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to infection reporting of health care facilities and telehealth services
Title
Modifies provisions relating to infection reporting of health care facilities and telehealth services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: SB 579 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: SB 579 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-04-26 | House | S Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted |
2016-04-26 | House | S concurs in HA 2 |
2016-04-26 | House | S concurs in HA 1 |
2016-04-20 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2016-04-20 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Barnes)--(4862S02.09H) |
2016-04-20 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Allen)--(4862S02.17H) |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-03-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-02-17 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-16 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-15 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-03 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & ruled out of order (Nasheed)--(4862S02.01S) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 579-Schaaf, et al |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |