MO SB578 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows port authority boards to establish port improvement districts to fund projects with voter-approved sales taxes or property taxes
Title
Allows port authority boards to establish port improvement districts to fund projects with voter-approved sales taxes or property taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by Senate President | |
2010-05-25 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2010-05-03 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-04-15 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-04-14 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Do Pass H Job Creation and Economic Development Committee | |
2010-04-13 | Voted Do Pass H Job Creation and Economic Development Committee | |
2010-04-06 | Hearing Conducted H Job Creation and Economic Development Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Referred H Job Creation and Economic Development Committee | |
2010-02-22 | H Second Read | |
2010-02-18 | H First Read | |
2010-02-18 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Perfected | |
2010-02-15 | SS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-02-15 | SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Ridgeway)--(3186S04.01S) | |
2010-02-15 | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Ridgeway)--(3168S04.02S) | |
2010-02-15 | SS S offered (Shields)--(3168S.04F) | |
2010-02-11 | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor | |
2010-02-08 | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 578-Shields | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled |