MO SB573 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 573-Schmitt, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 573-Schmitt, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to the investment policies of the state
Title
Modifies the law relating to the investment policies of the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 573 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 116 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SB 573-Schmitt, with HCS, as amended |
2016-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-11 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones)--(4617H07.07H) |
2016-05-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-05-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-27 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2016-02-29 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-25 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-25 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 573-Schmitt |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |