MO SB572 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 572-Rowden
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the "Community Crime Reduction Grant Program" which shall provide money to qualifying municipal police departments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "Community Crime Reduction Grant Program" which shall provide money to qualifying municipal police departments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 572-Rowden
2020-03-02SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2020-02-13SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2020-01-16SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 572-Rowden
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback