MO SB572 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies various provisions regarding municipalities located in St. Louis County, nuisance abatement ordinances, disincorporation procedures for various cities, and municipal courts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies various provisions regarding municipalities located in St. Louis County, nuisance abatement ordinances, disincorporation procedures for various cities, and municipal courts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 572 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 572 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 98 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 572 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 572 (*HA 4) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 572 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 572 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 572 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-17HouseSigned by Governor
2016-05-25HouseDelivered to Governor
2016-05-25HouseSigned by House Speaker
2016-05-25HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2016-05-25HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2016-05-12HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2016-05-12HouseCCS#2 H Third Read and Passed
2016-05-12HouseCCR#2 H adopted
2016-05-11HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2016-05-11HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2016-05-10HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2016-05-10HouseH distributes CCR#2
2016-05-10SenateCCS#2 S Third Read and Passed--(4953S.14S)
2016-05-10SenateCCR#2 S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(4953S14.1SR)
2016-05-10SenateH conferees appointed: Cornejo, McGaugh, Curtman, Rizzo, Mitten
2016-05-10SenateS conferees appointed: Schmitt, Schaefer, Dixon, Keaveny, Holsman
2016-05-10SenateS grants further conference
2016-05-10SenateH requests further conference
2016-05-10SenateH refuses to adopt CCR
2016-05-10SenateReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2016-05-10SenateVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2016-05-09SenateReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2016-05-09SenateH distributes CCR
2016-05-06HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed--(4953S.13S)
2016-05-06HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(4953S13.1SR)
2016-05-03HouseS conferees appointed: Schmitt, Schaefer, Dixon, Keaveny, Holsman
2016-05-03HouseH conferees appointed: Cornejo, McGaugh, Curtman, Rizzo, Mitten
2016-05-03HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2016-05-03HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
2016-04-28HouseH Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
2016-04-28HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2016-04-28HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(4953H09.30H)
2016-04-28HouseHA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2016-04-28HouseHA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davis)--(4953H09.36H)
2016-04-28HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered (Brattin)--(4953H09.24H)
2016-04-28HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (Roden)--(4953H09.02H)
2016-04-28HouseLaid over
2016-04-28HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(4953H09.31H)
2016-04-28HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones)--(4953H09.28H)
2016-04-28HouseHA 1 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2016-04-28HouseHA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black)--(4953H09.35H)
2016-04-28HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered (McGaugh)--(4953H09.26H)
2016-04-27HouseLaid over
2016-04-27HouseTaken up
2016-04-21HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
2016-04-20HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
2016-04-07HouseReferred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
2016-04-07HouseReported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCA 2, 3, 4, HCA 1 to HCA 5, HCA 5, aa, HCA 6 & HCA 7
2016-04-06HouseVoted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/Amendments
2016-03-16HouseHearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings
2016-02-24HouseReferred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings
2016-02-01HouseH Second Read
2016-01-28HouseH First Read
2016-01-28SenateS Third Read and Passed
2016-01-27SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2016-01-26SenatePerfected
2016-01-26SenateSS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2016-01-26SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4953S07.06S)
2016-01-26SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Holsman)--(4953S07.04S)
2016-01-26SenateSS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)--(4953S.07F)
2016-01-21SenateReported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee w/SCS
2016-01-20SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4953S.05C)
2016-01-13SenateHearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2016-01-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2016-01-06SenateS First Read--SB 572-Schmitt
2015-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246557
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB572.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/comm/SB572.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/perf/SB572.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0572.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/tat/SB572.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/Journals/RDay130128194-208.pdf#199
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/061.008.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/061.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/061.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/061.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/070.027.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/070.028.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/070.026.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback