MO SB567 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 567-Chappelle-Nadal, et al
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 567-Chappelle-Nadal, et al
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a person shall be liable for depriving another of a Missouri Constitutional right while acting under the color of law
Title
Provides that a person shall be liable for depriving another of a Missouri Constitutional right while acting under the color of law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 567-Chappelle-Nadal, et al |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 567-Chappelle-Nadal, et al |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4722802 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB567.pdf |