MO SB566 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - No Motion made to override Governor's Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires owners of dogs and cats under suspicion of carrying rabies to provide documentation of vaccination or else surrender the animal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires owners of dogs and cats under suspicion of carrying rabies to provide documentation of vaccination or else surrender the animal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-12 No Motion made to override Governor's Veto
2012-07-12 Vetoed by Governor
2012-05-30 Delivered to Governor
2012-05-30 Signed by House Speaker
2012-05-30 Signed by Senate President
2012-05-30 Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2012-05-17 Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2012-05-17 S Third Read and Passed, as amended
2012-05-17 S concurs in HA 2
2012-05-17 S concurs in HA 1
2012-05-17 Motion to dissolve conference committee S adopted
2012-05-14 H conferees appointed: Jones-117, Loehner, Brattin, Harris, Shively
2012-05-14 H refuses to recede on HA 1 & HA 2 and grants conference
2012-05-10 S requests H recede or grant conference
2012-05-10 S refuses to concur in HA 1 & HA 2
2012-05-09 H Third Read and Passed, as amended
2012-05-09 HA 2 H offered & adopted (Jones-117)--(4598S05.03H)
2012-05-09 HA 1 H offered & adopted (Loehner)--(4598S05.01H)
2012-04-26 Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-04-26 Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-04-26 Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-04-25 Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
2012-04-25 Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues in Animal Agriculture Committee
2012-04-24 Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues in Animal Agriculture Committee
2012-04-24 Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues in Animal Agriculture Committee
2012-04-17 Referred H Emerging Issues in Animal Agriculture Committee
2012-04-10 H Second Read
2012-04-05 H First Read
2012-04-05 S Third Read and Passed
2012-04-03 Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
2012-04-03 Perfected
2012-04-03 SCS S adopted
2012-03-22 Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor w/SCS
2012-02-22 SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - (4598S.05C)
2012-01-11 Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2012-01-05 Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2012-01-04 S First Read--SB 566-Brown
2011-12-14 Prefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback