MO SB551 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (2650S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (2650S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to mental health programs for law enforcement officers
Title
Creates provisions relating to mental health programs for law enforcement officers
Sponsors
Sen. Karla May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (2650S.02C) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | S First Read |