MO SB55 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions related to elementary and secondary education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions related to elementary and secondary education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
2021-02-23SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-02-23SenateSS#2 for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2021-02-23SenateSA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(1007S06.06S)
2021-02-23SenateSA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Moon)--(1007S06.01S)
2021-02-23SenateSS#2 for SCS S offered (Rowden)--(1007S.06F)
2021-02-23SenateSS for SCS S withdrawn
2021-02-23SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S withdrawn
2021-02-23SenateSA 1 to SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Koenig)--(1007S05.48S)
2021-02-23SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(1007S05.47S)
2021-02-23SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2021-02-23SenateSA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Rowden)--(1007S05.45S)
2021-02-23SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Rowden)--(1007S05.44S)
2021-02-23SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-02-23SenateSS for SCS S offered (Rowden, O'Laughlin & Koenig)--(1007S.05F)
2021-01-26SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-01-25SenateReported from S Education Committee w/SCS
2021-01-21SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 55, 23 & 25) Education Committee (1007S.02C)
2021-01-19SenateHearing Conducted S Education Committee
2021-01-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=54243591
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/intro/SB55.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/SCSfromResearch/SB55.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/comm/SB55.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3255
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3264
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3261
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3265
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3266
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3269
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3273
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3270
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3272
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=134045228&BillID=54243591
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/1007S.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=135704483&BillID=54243591
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/1007S.02C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=137957659&BillID=54243591
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=138058030&BillID=54243591

Bill Comments

feedback