MO SB527 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates each March 27th as "Medical Radiation Safety Awareness Day"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates each March 27th as "Medical Radiation Safety Awareness Day"

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-10HouseSigned by Governor
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30HouseReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-16HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-05-01HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-01HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseReported Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-04-17HouseVoted Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-04-03HouseHearing Conducted H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-03-26HouseReferred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-02-24HouseH Second Read
2014-02-20HouseH First Read
2014-02-20SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2014-02-13SenateReported from S General Laws Committee to Floor-Consent
2014-02-11SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S General Laws Committee - Consent vote adopted
2014-02-11SenateVoted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
2014-02-04SenateHearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2014-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 527-Wallingford
2013-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback