MO SB524 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 524-Sater
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 524-Sater
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Social Services to apply for a global waiver for MO HealthNet
Title
Requires the Department of Social Services to apply for a global waiver for MO HealthNet
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 524-Sater |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 524-Sater |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838139 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB524.pdf |