MO SB523 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 523-Sater, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 523-Sater, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to criminal background checks for child care providers
Title
Modifies provisions relating to criminal background checks for child care providers
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 523-Sater, with SCS |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee w/SCS |
2017-04-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (2270S.02C) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | S First Read--SB 523-Sater |