MO SB520 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the review of certain financing orders by the Missouri Public Service Commission
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the review of certain financing orders by the Missouri Public Service Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | S First Read |