MO SB52 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 52-Eigel, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 52-Eigel, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 52-Eigel, with SCS |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0111S.02C) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 52-Eigel |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |