MO SB515 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Director of the Department of Insurance to prescribe by rule uniform application forms for group health insurance policies
Title
Requires Director of the Department of Insurance to prescribe by rule uniform application forms for group health insurance policies
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 515-Schaaf | |
2011-12-05 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=91 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB515.pdf |