MO SB509 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to income taxes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to income taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-06HouseLegislature voted to override Governor's veto
2014-05-06HouseMotion to override Governor's veto H taken up & adopted
2014-05-05HouseMotion to override Governor's veto H offered & laid over (Koenig)
2014-05-05HouseMotion to override Governor's veto S adopted (Kraus)
2014-05-01HouseVetoed by Governor
2014-04-16HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-04-16HouseSigned by House Speaker
2014-04-16HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-04-16HouseReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-04-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-04-16HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-04-14HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-14HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-10HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-10HouseReported Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee
2014-04-10HouseVoted Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee
2014-04-10HouseHearing Conducted H Ways and Means Committee
2014-04-07HouseReferred H Ways and Means Committee
2014-04-02HouseH Second Read
2014-04-01HouseH First Read
2014-04-01SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-04-01SenateReported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
2014-03-31SenateVoted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-03-31SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-03-31SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-03-26SenatePerfected
2014-03-26SenateSS#3 for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2014-03-26SenateSA 1 to SS#3 for SCS S offered & adopted (Lamping)--(4324S18.02S)
2014-03-26SenateSS#3 for SCS S offered (Kraus)--(4324S.18F)
2014-03-26SenateSS#2 for SCS S withdrawn
2014-03-10SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-03-10SenateSA 2 to SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & Ruled out of order (Silvey)--(4324S16.03S)
2014-03-10SenateSA 1 to SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(4324S16.02S)
2014-03-10SenateSA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Schmitt)--(4324S16.01S)
2014-03-10SenateSS#2 for SCS S offered (Kraus)--(4324S.16F)
2014-03-10SenateSS for SCS S withdrawn
2014-03-05SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-03-05SenateSA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)--(4324S12.10S)
2014-03-05SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)--(4324S12.03S)
2014-03-05SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-03-05SenateSS for SCS S offered (Kraus)--(4324S.12F)
2014-03-05SenateSA 1 to SCS S withdrawn
2014-02-11SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-02-11SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered (LeVota)--(4324S04.18S)
2014-02-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-01-28SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS
2014-01-23SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SBs 509 & 496) S Ways and Means Committee - (4324S.04C)
2014-01-16SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2014-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 509-Kraus
2013-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback