MO SB490 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies training requirements for certified nursing assistants
Title
Modifies training requirements for certified nursing assistants
Sponsors
Sen. John Rizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 490-Rizzo |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5253269 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB490.pdf |