MO SB489 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that judges must disqualify themselves from hearing a proceeding in certain situations
Title
Mandates that judges must disqualify themselves from hearing a proceeding in certain situations
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 489-Lager |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723578 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB489.pdf |