MO SB488 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 488-Kehoe, with HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 488-Kehoe, with HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the conveyance of state property
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the conveyance of state property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 488 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SB 488-Kehoe, with HCS |
2017-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-10 | House | HCS H adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Corrections and Public Institutions |
2017-04-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Corrections and Public Institutions |
2017-04-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Corrections and Public Institutions |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred H Corrections and Public Institutions |
2017-03-28 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-27 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed, as amended - Consent |
2017-03-27 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Kehoe)--(2206S01.01S) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S General Laws Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 488-Kehoe |