MO SB485 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the law governing liens

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the law governing liens

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 Signed by Governor
2012-05-30 Delivered to Governor
2012-05-30 Signed by House Speaker
2012-05-30 Signed by Senate President
2012-05-30 Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2012-05-17 Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2012-05-17 S Third Read and Passed
2012-05-17 S concurs in HCS, as amended
2012-05-17 Motion to dissolve conference committee S adopted
2012-05-16 H conferees appointed: Wells, Cierpiot, Richardson, Kelly-24, Atkins
2012-05-16 S conferees appointed: Cunningham, Ridgeway, Nieves, McKenna, Wright-Jones
2012-05-16 H refuses to recede and grants conference
2012-05-15 S requests H recede or grant conference
2012-05-15 S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
2012-05-15 H Third Read and Passed
2012-05-15 HCS, as amended, H adopted
2012-05-15 HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wells)--(4504L03.02H)
2012-05-15 HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(4504L03.01H)
2012-05-03 HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-05-03 HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-05-03 Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-04-26 Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
2012-04-26 HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
2012-04-25 HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
2012-04-25 Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee
2012-04-17 Referred H Judiciary Committee
2012-02-17 H Second Read
2012-02-16 H First Read
2012-02-16 S Third Read and Passed
2012-02-14 Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
2012-02-13 Perfected
2012-02-13 SCS S adopted
2012-02-09 Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS
2012-02-02 Removed S Consent Calendar
2012-02-02 Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
2012-01-25 SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee -Consent - (4504S.02C)
2012-01-18 Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
2012-01-05 Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
2012-01-04 S First Read--SB 485-Cunningham
2011-12-01 Prefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback