MO SB465 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 465-Burlison (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 465-Burlison (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to early childhood education programs
Title
Modifies provisions relating to early childhood education programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 465-Burlison (In Fiscal Oversight) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-04-10 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2019-04-10 | Senate | SA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(2230S03.03F) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(2230S03.01S) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Burlison)--(2230S03.02S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (2230S.03C) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Government Reform Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 465-Burlison |