MO SB455 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 455-Kehoe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 455-Kehoe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits political subdivisions from establishing a minimum wage in excess of federal or state law
Title
Prohibits political subdivisions from establishing a minimum wage in excess of federal or state law
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 455-Kehoe |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 455-Kehoe |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3882337 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB455.pdf |