MO SB453 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Stop Socialism Act which creates a cause of action against a public body that offers a competitive service to the economic detriment of a person offering the same competitive service
Title
Establishes the Stop Socialism Act which creates a cause of action against a public body that offers a competitive service to the economic detriment of a person offering the same competitive service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | S First Read |