MO SB445 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to environmental protection
Title
Modifies provisions relating to environmental protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-06 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Romine)--(1944S06.1SR) |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-06 | House | H distributes CCR (1944S06.1SR) |
2015-05-05 | House | S conferees appointed: Romine, Kehoe, Wallingford, Schupp, Holsman |
2015-05-04 | House | H conferees appointed: Miller, Remole, Bondon, Smith, Nichols |
2015-05-04 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2015-04-30 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2015-04-30 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2015-04-30 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-04-30 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (English)--(1944H04.12H) |
2015-04-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14) |
2015-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14) |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14) Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Energy and the Environment Committee w/HCAs 1 & 2 |
2015-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass H Energy and the Environment Committee w/Amendments |
2015-04-21 | House | Hearing Conducted H Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred H Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-13 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-08 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Romine)--(1944S03.01S) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-03-19 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (1944S.03C) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | S First Read--SB 445-Romine |