MO SB435 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions related to certain payments made to businesses owned by licensed real estate salespersons and broker-salespersons
Title
Creates provisions related to certain payments made to businesses owned by licensed real estate salespersons and broker-salespersons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | S First Read |