MO SB432 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (1895S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (1895S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates contingency-fee contracts between state entities and private attorneys
Title
Regulates contingency-fee contracts between state entities and private attorneys
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (1895S.02C) | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing Scheduled S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-03-01 | S First Read--SB 432-Munzlinger |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4205520 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB432.pdf |