MO SB421 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies ballot language for the public safety sales tax in Springfield
Title
Modifies ballot language for the public safety sales tax in Springfield
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 421-Dixon |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3044802 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB421.pdf |