MO SB42 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-24 - Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 4, 42 & 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-24 - Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 4, 42 & 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding elementary and secondary education
Title
Modifies provisions regarding elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | Senate | Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 4, 42 & 89 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |