MO SB407 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 407-Riddle, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 407-Riddle, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Licenses persons performing radiologic imaging or administering radiation therapy and establishes the Missouri Radiologic Imaging and Radiation Therapy Board of Examiners
Title
Licenses persons performing radiologic imaging or administering radiation therapy and establishes the Missouri Radiologic Imaging and Radiation Therapy Board of Examiners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 407-Riddle, with SCS |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS |
2017-04-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (1610S.02C) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 407-Riddle |