MO SB405 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public safety
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-05-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-04-26 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2017-03-28 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-27 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-27 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - Consent vote adopted (1807S.02C) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (1807S.02C) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - Consent |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 405-Hegeman |