MO SB403 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 403-Nieves
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 403-Nieves
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions pertaining to the filing of appeals regarding decisions made by environmental commissions
Title
Modifies provisions pertaining to the filing of appeals regarding decisions made by environmental commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 403-Nieves | |
2011-04-14 | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor | |
2011-04-12 | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-04-12 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-03-01 | S First Read--SB 403-Nieves |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4203956 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB403.pdf |