MO SB399 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 399-Onder
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 399-Onder
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the paper ballot as the official ballot and requires audits before election certification
Title
Establishes the paper ballot as the official ballot and requires audits before election certification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 399-Onder |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 399-Onder |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2585265 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB399.pdf |