MO SB394 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 394-Romine, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 394-Romine, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public employee retirement systems
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public employee retirement systems
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] | Rep. Cora Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 394 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 394 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 5 N: 136 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 394 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 5 N: 136 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SB 394-Romine, with HCS, as amended |
2017-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated |
2017-05-10 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dogan)--(1774H02.10H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Plocher)--(1774H02.06H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Walker)--(1774H02.07H) |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Pensions |
2017-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Pensions |
2017-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H Pensions |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Pensions |
2017-03-24 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-16 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 394-Romine |