MO SB387 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (1478S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (1478S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to behavioral health services for certain accused persons
Title
Modifies provisions relating to behavioral health services for certain accused persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (1478S.03C) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled |