MO SB387 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (1878S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (1878S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions required to be in nuisance abatement ordinances enacted by municipalities and counties
Title
Modifies provisions required to be in nuisance abatement ordinances enacted by municipalities and counties
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (1878S.02C) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 387-Wasson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2501419 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB387.pdf |