MO SB387 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for release on electronic monitoring for people who can afford to pay the costs associated with the monitoring
Title
Allows for release on electronic monitoring for people who can afford to pay the costs associated with the monitoring
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R] | Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-05-04 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-05-04 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-05-02 | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-14 | H First Read | |
2011-04-14 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-11 | Perfected | |
2011-04-11 | SCS S adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-04-04 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (1786S.04C) | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-03-01 | S First Read--SB 387-Wasson |