MO SB381 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a circuit judge to assess certain costs when the criminal case is dismissed and the criminal defendant consents
Title
Allows a circuit judge to assess certain costs when the criminal case is dismissed and the criminal defendant consents
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-28 | S First Read--SB 381-Dixon |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4200913 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB381.pdf |