MO SB374 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - (1780S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - (1780S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes qualifications and appointment procedures for county recorders where the offices of the court clerk and recorder of deeds are separate
Title
Establishes qualifications and appointment procedures for county recorders where the offices of the court clerk and recorder of deeds are separate
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - (1780S.03C) | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing Cancelled S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-28 | S First Read--SB 374-Parson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4200906 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB374.pdf |