MO SB366 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the provisions of the Missouri higher education savings program
Title
Modifies the provisions of the Missouri higher education savings program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2015-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Higher Education |
2015-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Higher Education |
2015-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Higher Education |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred H Higher Education |
2015-04-27 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-23 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-23 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-21 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(1887S.05F) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | S First Read--SB 366-Schmitt |