MO SB366 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Missouri cooperative associations and modifies the law relating to the conversion of certain business organizations
Title
Creates Missouri cooperative associations and modifies the law relating to the conversion of certain business organizations
Sponsors
Rep. John Diehl [R] | Sen. Jack Goodman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-02 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-02 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-02 | S concurs in HCS, as amended | |
2011-04-28 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-28 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-04-28 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(1676L03.01L) | |
2011-04-26 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-22 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-20 | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee | |
2011-04-19 | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee | |
2011-04-19 | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Referred H General Laws Committee | |
2011-04-11 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-07 | H First Read | |
2011-04-07 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Perfected | |
2011-04-06 | SCS S adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-30 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - (1676.02C) | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-28 | S First Read--SB 366-Goodman |