MO SB362 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 362-Hummel
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 362-Hummel
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a student to receive instruction in Braille reading and writing as part of his or her individualized education plan unless instruction in Braille is determined not appropriate for the child
Title
Requires a student to receive instruction in Braille reading and writing as part of his or her individualized education plan unless instruction in Braille is determined not appropriate for the child
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 362-Hummel |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 362-Hummel |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=58177495 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB362.pdf |