MO SB349 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the expansion of MO HealthNet services beginning on January 1, 2014
Title
Provides for the expansion of MO HealthNet services beginning on January 1, 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Paul LeVota [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | S First Read--SB 349-LeVota |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=18647178 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB349.pdf |