MO SB344 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 344-Eigel, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 344-Eigel, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions for storage and transport of intoxicating liquor from a central warehouse to premises licensed to sell intoxicating liquors at retail
Title
Establishes provisions for storage and transport of intoxicating liquor from a central warehouse to premises licensed to sell intoxicating liquors at retail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 344-Eigel, with SCS |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (1706S.05C) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 344-Eigel |