MO SB340 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes an intersectional reference in a provision of law regarding the determination of heirship
Title
Changes an intersectional reference in a provision of law regarding the determination of heirship
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | HCS H defeated |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-13 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-05-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2015-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2015-04-22 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-30 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-03-30 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted (1760S.02C) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (1760S.02C) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 340-Pearce |