MO SB332 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (In Fiscal Review) |
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-05-01 | House | Executive Session postponed H General Laws |
2017-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2017-03-24 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-16 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 332-Hegeman |