MO SB32 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 32-Emery, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 32-Emery, with SCS
2017-03-29SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS
2017-02-01SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (0399S.06C)
2017-01-25SenateHearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
2017-01-18SenateHearing Cancelled S Government Reform Committee
2017-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 32-Emery
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback